Trustees LANGTON GREEN COMMUNITY SPORTS ASSOCIATION LTD.
Charity number: 1157693

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY JAMES LAMBERT | Chair | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Millie Woodliffe | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Stretton | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Russell | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Janet Lyle | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elizabeth Kerr-Sheppard | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Douglas Ponsford | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN CHRISTOPHER ALLDIS | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MILES ALLEN | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN WILLIAM CULVERHOUSE | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.