Financial history THE CAREER COLLEGES TRUST

Charity number: 1162957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £462.08k £488.52k £407.20k £342.65k £136.33k
Total expenditure £454.30k £484.42k £490.64k £318.56k £105.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A