THE CAREER COLLEGES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education through: (a) assisting in the establishment of colleges for 14-18 year olds for the provision of vocationally-focussed programmes of study (Career Colleges); and (b) advancing the efficiency and effectiveness of the education in Career Colleges by the provision of educational support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Silverman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Gilbert | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Janet Anne Lloyd | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £462.08k | £488.52k | £407.20k | £342.65k | £136.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £454.30k | £484.42k | £490.64k | £318.56k | £105.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 August 2020 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 14 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF COLLEGES FOR 14-18 YEAR OLDS FOR THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONALLY-FOCUSSED PROGRAMMES OF STUDY (CAREER COLLEGES): (B) ADVANCING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE EDUCATION IN CAREER COLLEGES BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
Block C
The Wharf
Manchester Road
BURNLEY
Lancashi
- Phone:
- 01282426331
- Email:
- BJONES@CAREERCOLLEGES.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window