Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL HUMAN DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1158660
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 11 April 2022 | 497 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 02 February 2021 | 430 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window