STAND AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivery of educational workshops and resources around issues of violence prevention including bullying. Services to work with other agencies on the prevention of violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 2014: CIO registration
- 08 March 2016: Funds received from 1135475 STAND AGAINST VIOLENCE
- STAND AGAINST VIOLENCE1 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Hockey | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steph Reynolds | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Rey | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Vickery | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Fouracre | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carly Anderson | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Mawer | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Alice Grace Berry ACCA, MAAT | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.83k | £129.34k | £148.83k | £177.76k | £166.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.72k | £117.14k | £217.49k | £238.77k | £137.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £57.50k | £30.74k | £46.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 31 MAR 2014 AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE. IN PARTICULAR TO DISCOURAGE THEM FROM ANTI-SOCIAL BEHAVIOUR AND VIOLENT CRIME BY MAKING THEM AWARE OF ITS CONSEQUENCES, IN ORDER TO REDUCE AND PREVENT FUTURE VIOLENCE. TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN ENGLAND AND WALES PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO THE REDUCTION AND PREVENTION OF VIOLENCE AND IMPROVING SAFETY IN COMMUNITIES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 312
Bridge House
7 Bridge Street
TAUNTON
Somerset
- Phone:
- 03004564223
- Email:
- INFO@SAV-ED.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window