Accounts and annual returns SURGO FOUNDATION UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1157510
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On Time