THE ABASEEN FOUNDATION U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundations objectives are for such exclusively charitable purposes for the benefits of the inhabitants of Pakistan in particular but not exclusively for the provision of financial assistance, advice and goods and equipment to the Abaseen Foundation in Peshawar, Khyber Pakhtunkhwa, Pakistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Pakistan
Governance
- 12 May 2014: CIO registration
- 25 April 2017: Funds received from 1095882 THE ABASEEN FOUNDATION U.K.
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Erica Lewis | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Rehmani | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ikrash Darr | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shakil Salam | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Owen | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robina Afzal | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ansell | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Le Mare | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Waddington | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BINGLEY | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
INAYAT MUNSHI | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARY LOWE | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HAFIZA SULEMAN | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOSEPH MCKEOWN | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £522.25k | £687.94k | £221.05k | £309.89k | £258.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £524.12k | £598.06k | £223.72k | £361.23k | £226.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £521.26k | £92.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £594.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £994 | £850 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £477.65k | £572.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £572.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £46.47k | £25.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 May 2014
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF PAKISTAN (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ADVISE AND GOODS AND EQUIPMENT TO THE ABASEEN FOUNDATION IN PESHAWAR, NORTH WEST FRONTIER PROVINCE, PAKISTAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FORGE HOUSE
CATON
LANCASTER
LA2 9NB
- Phone:
- 01524770832
- Email:
- helen.bingley@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window