NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HOSPICE AT HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the public to promote the efficiency and effectiveness of charities & the effective use of resources for charitable purposes by charitable and non charitable bodies providing end of life care for people in their own homes. The Association exists to support the members & other organisations as they strive to develop and improve the end of life care provided in patients own homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 August 2014: CIO registration
- NAHH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Eskins | Chair | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
lyndsey caldwell | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Robson | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Welbeck-Pure | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Clapton | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Stewart Marks | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Barley | Trustee | 02 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.23k | £11.50k | £12.46k | £11.84k | £12.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.76k | £9.20k | £17.10k | £11.28k | £16.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 15 AUG 2014 AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES PROVIDING PALLIATIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE FOR PEOPLE IN THEIR OWN HOMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Compleat Conference Co Ltd
LANCASTER COURT
8 Barnes Wallis Road
FAREHAM
PO15 5TU
- Phone:
- 01489 668333
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window