CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the girls in our care with opportunities to fulfill the objectives of the Guide Association through a balanced girl lead programme of activities such as outdoors, crafts, learning new skills etc. in our own guide headquarters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 09 October 1975: Standard registration
- CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH GUIDE ASSOCIATION SUPPORTERS COMMITTEE (Working name)
- CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Sian Finney | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE SPROSON | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SHAW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.06k | £11.54k | £21.12k | £3.66k | £160 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £1.71k | £4.31k | £8.03k | £1.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.77k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS OF 26 OCTOBER 1949, 27 APRIL 1960, 4 SEPTEMBER 1981 AND 20 JULY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD.
Area of benefit
CHAPEL-EN-LE-FRITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 CHURCH ROAD
NEW MILLS
HIGH PEAK
SK22 4PF
- Phone:
- 01663743275
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window