Financial history TRANSFORM TRAINING LTD

Charity number: 1158831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £181.23k £246.57k £206.06k £187.44k £169.76k
Total expenditure £155.06k £195.28k £204.05k £185.19k £157.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.07k £19.25k £54.38k £67.30k £92.04k