THE CAMERON BESPOLKA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust helps young people pursue an interest in nature and especially birds. We will be creating opportunities for young people to learn about nature and also, where possible, how it can lead to a career. We will partner with local organisations to achieve this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Norfolk
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 08 April 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alasdair Roberton | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Talks | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sienna Bespolka | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN BESPOLKA | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MEGAN HERMANNA BESPOLKA | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JAMES BESPOLKA | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CORINNE CRUICKSHANK | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.71k | £53.54k | £103.56k | £129.44k | £52.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.95k | £23.32k | £398.81k | £45.72k | £35.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 November 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, AND IN PARTICULAR; - TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN RELATION TO CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WILD BIRDS AND NATURAL HABITATS; AND - TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR ENGAGEMENT WITH THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, AND IN PARTICULAR THEIR APPRECIATION OF WILD BIRDS AND THEIR HABITATS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Giles House
St. Giles Hill
Winchester
SO23 0HH
- Phone:
- 01962860418
- Email:
- info@cameronbespolka.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window