Financial history VERNON INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1156797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.38k £66.52k £76.89k £71.98k £78.84k
Total expenditure £58.98k £65.68k £65.25k £72.40k £82.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.55k £12.00k N/A £5.00k