OLIVE TREE CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Olive Tree Cancer Support Group is an independent charity providing support to cancer patients, their carers and families. Complementing the services provided by NHS, we provide information, emotional support and complementary therapy with an ever-expanding offer of additional services including counselling, coaching, hypnotherapy, scar therapy, lymphatic drainage massage and other workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Chrismas | Chair | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sai Yeung Ng | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Hogan | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lineham | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yulia Baynham | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.56k | £168.34k | £114.94k | £184.23k | £104.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.86k | £130.85k | £97.69k | £107.39k | £186.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS WITH CANCER,AND THE PARTNERS,FAMILIES,FRIENDS AND CARERS OF SUCH PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WENTWORTH HOUSE
CRAWLEY HOSPITAL
WEST GREEN DRIVE
CRAWLEY
WEST SUSSEX
RH11 7DH
- Phone:
- 01293534465
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window