Accounts and annual returns KATAPULT KILIMANJARO

Charity number: 1162892
Charity reporting is overdue by 1079 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
Annual return 29 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 714 days
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 714 days
Annual return 29 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1079 days
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1079 days
Annual return 29 July 2020 27 March 2022 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2020 27 March 2022 302 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 July 2019 27 March 2022 667 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2019 27 March 2022 667 days late Download Open in new window