BITE SIZE PIECES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bite Size Pieces works at grassroots level to encourage people, families and communities to benefit from the productive use of their time, skills and experience in an enterprising way. It aims to provide a combination of skills, know-how and mentoring to support community projects, share information and good practice so that many small achievements can build towards lasting improvements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 March 2014: Standard registration
- 12 November 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 12 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1104736 WESTHILL ENDOWMENT
- BITE SIZE (BIRMINGHAM) (Previous name)
- BITE SIZE PIECES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163 | £59 | £133 | £115 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.09k | £6.91k | £13.56k | £10.10k | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 10 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 22 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY@S OBJECTS("OBJECTS")ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:-FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS:-(1)TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES BY:(A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE,DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;AND BY(B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS,CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.(2)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN,RELIGION,BELIEF,CREED,AGE OR GENDER AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY THE PROVISION OF VARIOUS COMMUNITY PROJECTS WITH A VIEW TO EQUIPPING PEOPLE WITH SKILLS TO BECOME EMPLOYED AND MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window