Trustees THE LLANDUDNO AREA U3A

Charity Number: 1157372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaine Susan Elizabeth Beech Trustee 06 December 2024
None on record
Ann Marjorie Yates Trustee 05 November 2024
None on record
ANN DAVIDSON Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Lillian Turner Macgregor Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
Richard Joplin Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Kathleen Edith Main Trustee 29 March 2023
None on record
Tina Angela Doyle Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Andrew Smith Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Stephen Jordan Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record