THE EY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to create and support pathways for young people and entrepreneurs into education, employment and enterprise to help build stronger communities and a more sustainable economy. The programmes we deliver, the independence of our fundraising and the support we provide to other charities sharing our mission, makes us a pioneering force in the UK's charitable foundation sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,648,670
Donations and legacies | £3.14m | |
Charitable activities | £493.71k | |
Other trading activities | £990 | |
Investments | £18.19k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,755,868
Raising funds | £1.02m | |
Charitable activities | £2.73m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.02m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.73m |
People

51 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
2010 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edel Harris | Chair | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Hodges Gibson | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucia Wilde | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Hargreaves | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erol Mustafa | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Baugh | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Cavin | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Sandy Thomas | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julianna Oladipo | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hutchinson | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sayeh Ghanbari | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/06/2020 | 29/06/2021 | 29/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06m | £3.50m | £4.13m | £4.01m | £3.82m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32m | £3.28m | £3.64m | £4.03m | £3.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £80.71k | £170.65k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.61m | £2.97m | £3.30m | £3.20m | £3.14m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £8.88k | £990 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £434.32k | £522.73k | £832.61k | £797.91k | £493.71k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £18.19k | |
|
Income - Other | £22.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.47m | £2.16m | £2.43m | £3.00m | £2.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £848.68k | £1.12m | £1.21m | £1.03m | £1.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £60.34k | £80.76k | £76.79k | £73.69k | £58.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/06/2020 | 29/06/2021 | 29/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £41.52k | £58.29k | £50.29k | £42.29k | £34.29k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.09m | £2.17m | £2.20m | £2.39m | £2.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.05m | £920.39k | £448.66k | £750.00k | £512.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 June 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 June 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 OCT 2017 as amended on 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME. IN THE ARTICLES, CHARITABLE MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THE SYSTEM OF LAW GOVERNING THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHARITY IS THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ERNST & YOUNG LLP
1 MORE LONDON PLACE
LONDON
SE1 2AF
- Phone:
- 02079513133
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window