INTERNATIONAL VALUES-BASED EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing, supporting and extending the practice of Values Education to bring positive, commonly-held values into teaching and places of learning and into everyday life, including provision of training and resources to schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Australia
- Bahrain
- Belgium
- Brunei
- China
- Cyprus
- Denmark
- Egypt
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Israel
- Jamaica
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Philippines
- Qatar
- Seychelles
- Singapore
- South Sudan
- Sweden
- Tunisia
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 16 December 2014: Standard registration
- IVET (Working name)
- The IVET Foundation (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NEIL HAWKES | Chair | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Jones | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET KNIGHT | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hawkes | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113 | £1.68k | £200 | £1.84k | £12.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.01k | £59 | £967 | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/12/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE, IN PARTICULAR, VALUES EDUCATION AND TO BRING POSITIVE, COMMONLY-HELD VALUES INTO TEACHING IN PLACES OF LEARNING AND INTO EVERYDAY LIFE IN ORDER TO INSPIRE CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS TO ADOPT POSITIVE VALUES IN THEIR OWN LIVES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, “VALUES EDUCATION” MEANS RAISING UNDERSTANDING AND AWARENESS OF THE DRIVERS AND CONSEQUENCES OF BEHAVIOUR ON THE SELF AND ON OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalkpit Nursery
Chalk Pit Lane
Burnham
Slough
SL1 8NH
- Phone:
- 01628660665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window