CRONFA MELINAU TREF ALAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's purpose is to advance and support education, social welfare, and the upkeep of cemeteries in the Tref Alaw area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 21 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dylan Owen | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Marie Jones | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
OWEN GLYN HUGHES | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GERAINT WYN OWEN | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR JONES | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREFOR GWYN ROWLANDS | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Iona Phillips | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|||||
William Peredur Hughes | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
FFION WYN ROBERTS | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
OWAIN SAMUEL OWEN | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
HUGH LLYWELYN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.86k | £30.75k | £31.55k | £35.05k | £41.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.81k | £24.13k | £31.63k | £28.50k | £31.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 May 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 May 2021 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 3.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CEMETERIES OF THE CHAPELS AND CHURCHES AT LLECHCYNFARWY, LLANBABO, LLANTRISANT, LLANDDEUSANT, BETHANIA, HOREB AND ELIM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Porfa Las
Llanddeusant
HOLYHEAD
LL65 4AD
- Phone:
- 01407730172
- Email:
- trefalaw@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window