Financial history RAMBAM SEPHARDI

Charity number: 1157540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.21k £56.00k £73.53k £44.96k £61.33k
Total expenditure £47.58k £39.17k £59.86k £54.08k £57.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A