RAMBAM SEPHARDI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND RELATED CULTURE OF SEPHARDI JEWS IN THE LONDON AND HERTFORDSHIRE AREA, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND SURROUNDING JEWISH COMMUNITIES, THROUGH PRAYER, CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND MEETINGS/EVENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF OUR COMMUNITY DURING TIMES OF NEED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 19 June 2014: CIO registration
- RAMBAM SEPHARDI SYNAGOGUE (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NATHAN HASSON | Chair | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH EZER ARAZI LLB | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOSEPH SHEENA | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.21k | £56.00k | £73.53k | £44.96k | £61.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.58k | £39.17k | £59.86k | £54.08k | £57.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CULTURE AND RELIGION OF SEPHARDI JEWS IN THE LONDON AND HERTFORDSHIRE AREA, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND SURROUNDING JEWISH COMMUNITIES, THROUGH PRAYER, CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND MEETINGS/EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Highwood Grove
London
NW7 3LY
- Phone:
- 07720805796
- Email:
- web@rambam.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window