MADDY'S SMILE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Derby 10k - April 2014 Race Night - November 2014 Derby 10k - April 2015 Manchester Marathon - April 2015 Maddy's Ball - June 2015 24hr Bicycle time trial Great North Run Sainsbury's charity of the year TSB Charity of the year Derby 3k London Marathon Wedding donation (from guests) Rolls Royce Bikers and Walkers Derby 10 mile Derby Half Marathon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derby City
Governance
- 03 June 2014: Standard registration
- 30 December 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 30 December 2022: Funds transferred to 1150203 UMBRELLA DERBY & DERBYSHIRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.59k | £2.77k | £359 | £486 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £13.87k | £587 | £216 | £606 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2019 | 13 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/05/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT,THE RELIEF OF NEED OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND DISABILITY LIVING WITHIN DERBY,BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH APPLIANCES,REMEDIAL EQUIPMENT,AND/OR ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE,IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window