WILTSHIRE PORTAGE

Charity Number: 1156717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing the Portage service to around 100 families in Wiltshire. This is a home visiting education service to pre-school children with significant developmental delays and difficulties.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £242,454
Total expenditure: £234,707

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2014: CIO registration
  • 25 November 2015: Funds received from 1108737 THE WEST WILTS PORTAGE SERVICE
  • 10 June 2022: Funds received from 1063962 WILTS SPECIAL NEEDS FUN DAYS
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tom Styles Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Julie Irene Inglis Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Sheila Gladys Parker Trustee 25 July 2018
WILTSHIRE RURAL MUSIC SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Emma Evans Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £227.96k £244.12k £218.01k £225.10k £242.45k
Total expenditure £233.82k £238.83k £249.09k £272.85k £234.71k
Income from government contracts £191.84k £192.93k £190.59k £190.59k £227.41k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kings Centre
Lodge Road
Pewsham
Chippenham
Wiltshire
SN15 3SY
Phone:
07780 653888