Trustees LEA ROWING CLUB LIMITED
Charity number: 1157563

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David James Porter | Chair | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ruth Carson | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charles Barry | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Louise Nickerson | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniil Slavin | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Kwiecinska | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Maguire Conneely | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antoinette Jucker | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DONALD RICHARD NIVISON ELLIS | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.