THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL

Charity Number: 1160017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the Christian religion of the Church in Wales for the public benefit. Promote the mission of the Church in Wales in and through the Cathedral by promoting the statement of faith. Resource the Cathedral for future ministry and mission. Achieve and develop lay and ordained vocations that enable and equip ministers and laity in mission, education and evangelism.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £286,610
Total expenditure: £429,460

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE VERY REV'D DR PAUL SHACKERLEY Chair 13 September 2014
BRECON CATHEDRAL CHOIR TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF BRECON CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: 22 days late
Rev Steven Ellsworth Griffith Trustee 19 July 2022
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
BRECON CATHEDRAL CHOIR TRUST
Received: On time
Nigel David Clubb Trustee 08 February 2022
THE TRUST FOR WELSH ARCHAEOLOGY
Received: On time
THE CLWYD-POWYS ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
Gloria Jones Powell Trustee 08 February 2022
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
Richard John Verge Trustee 08 February 2022
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
REVEREND PETER BROOKS Trustee 09 September 2015
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
GOWER MINISTRY AREA CIO
Recently registered
Rev Jonathan Davies Trustee 09 September 2015
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
THE VENERABLE ALUN JEVONS Trustee 01 July 2013
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BRECON CATHEDRAL DEON A CHABIDWL CADEIRLAN ABERHONDDU
Recently registered
FRIENDS OF BRECON CATHEDRAL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £282.00k £363.54k £382.25k £296.12k £286.61k
Total expenditure £261.63k £337.73k £304.85k £331.62k £429.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £101.65k £30.82k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cathedral Offices
Cathedral Close
BRECON
Powys
LD3 9DP
Phone:
01874623857