THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BANGOR CATHEDRAL

Charity Number: 1158340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian Religion of the Church in Wales

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £412,052
Total expenditure: £552,335

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Gwynedd

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 2014: Standard registration
  • 26 August 2022: Funds received from 1034844 THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF BANGOR BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF BANGOR CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Venerable David Allan Parry Chair 01 October 2023
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR
Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
HOMES OF BISHOP ROWLANDS
Received: On time
Rev Canon Roland Peter Barnes Trustee 30 March 2025
GUY HOWLAND JACKSON MEMORIAL
Received: On time
TAN Y MAEN LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev Canon Richard Stanton Wood Trustee 30 March 2025
ARDAL WEINIDOGAETH BRO TYSILIIO MINISTRY AREA
Charity reporting is overdue by 569 days
Canon Janet Frances Gough Trustee 18 August 2024
None on record
Rev Canon Alexier Olwen Mayes Trustee 18 August 2024
None on record
Canon Lesley Lee Horrocks Trustee 18 August 2024
None on record
Canon Gareth Iwan Jones Trustee 18 August 2024
None on record
Canon Jane Coutts Trustee 18 August 2024
None on record
Rev Canon Naomi Ernestine Starkey Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
The Venerable John Christopher Harvey Trustee 22 November 2022
ESTATE OF HELENA JUNIPER DECEASED
Received: On time
MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS
Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR
Received: On time
HOMES OF BISHOP ROWLANDS
Received: On time
Rev Canon Kimberley Victoria Williams Trustee 26 September 2021
ARDAL GWEINIDOGAETH BRO EIFIONYDD MINISTRY AREA
Received: On time
Rev Canon Alan Gordon Gyle Trustee 26 September 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S KNIGHTSBRIDGE
Received: On time
The Reverend Canon Tracy Jane Jones Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
CANON WILLIAMS Trustee 01 August 2014
BANGOR DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
BANGOR DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE BWRDD CYLLID ESGOBAETH BANGOR
Received: On time
CANON TOWNSEND Trustee 30 September 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £367.10k £254.71k £185.66k £326.00k £412.05k
Total expenditure £291.68k £254.72k £259.55k £698.18k £552.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 January 2024 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 January 2024 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ty Deiniol
Cathedral Close
BANGOR
LL57 1RL
Phone:
01248354999
Website:

bangor.churchinwales.org.uk