FRIENDS OF BURNAGE LIBRARY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Burnage Library Ltd. provides a range of learning, cultural, creative and social activities at Burnage Library and Activity Hub, Manchester. Our volunteer team also work alongside partners to provide an outreach library service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,940 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Manchester City
Governance
- 09 October 2014: Standard registration
- FOBL (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF BURNAGE LIBRARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Pudner | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Barbara Enobakhare | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hitchen | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dareema Akhtar Rehman | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Desmond McCrory | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
STELLA CLARE | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.57k | £64.10k | £63.81k | £33.44k | £68.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.82k | £67.20k | £59.56k | £34.37k | £57.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.92k | N/A | £19.70k | £23.68k | £29.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BURNAGE AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manchester City Council
Public Library
349 Burnage Lane
MANCHESTER
M19 1EW
- Phone:
- 07905832006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window