Trustees THE SILVERLININGCHARITY

Charity number: 1157749
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SHERRIE BAEHR Chair 07 July 2014
None on record
John Andrew Scorah Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Ross Andrew McDonald Trustee 24 September 2018
None on record
Suzanne Trask Trustee 16 March 2017
None on record
Peter Messervy Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
Kathryn BARRY Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record