ABBOTS LANGLEY PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an amateur community theatre group based in Abbots Langley, Hertfordshire. We produce produce and present plays, and other theatre-related activities such as workshops, open evenings and play readings, as well as social events. We welcome the active participation of the community in all our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 23 September 2014: Standard registration
- ALP (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Martin | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN CATHERINE JAMES | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Bolitho-Jones | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Funnell | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Gale | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £1.74k | £4.71k | £9.85k | £8.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.28k | £3.60k | £1.39k | £8.27k | £6.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/1957 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC OF ABBOTS LANGLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN AND INCREASE THEIR APPRECIATION OF THE DRAMATIC ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: (I)SUPPORTING THE CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY LIFE OF ABBOTS LANGLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, AND TO PROVIDE CULTURAL, RECREATIONAL AND ENTERTAINMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY (II)PRODUCING AND PRESENT PLAYS, IN WHICH THE COMMUNITY HAS THE OPPORTUNITY TO PARTICIPATE NOT ONLY AS MEMBERS OF THE AUDIENCE, BUT ALSO THROUGH MEMBERSHIP OF THE CHARITY AS ACTIVE PARTICIPANTS(III)PROVIDING OTHER OPPORTUNITIES, INCLUDING WORKSHOPS, OPEN EVENINGS AND PLAY READINGS, AS WELL AS OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES FOR MEMBERS AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, FOR NON-MEMBERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Haven
1, Seabrook Road
Kings Langley
Herts
WD4 8NU
- Phone:
- 07799 712633
- Email:
- abbotsplayers@gmail.com
- Website:
-
abbotslangleyplayers.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window