DELIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delight works in partnerships with primary schools serving areas of high deprivation and with local arts partners to deliver immersive arts programmes that engage children in education, through targeted social, academic and artistic outcomes, creating strong foundations for future learning & careers. Introducing art forms, career pathways and increasing community engagement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £47,115 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 December 2014: CIO registration
- DELIGHT CHARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTORIA MARIA FRANCIS BARRISTER | Chair | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Ee-Mei Lim | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matt Fox | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Carpenter | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brown | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.50k | £318.14k | £362.03k | £414.71k | £326.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.95k | £273.35k | £343.69k | £390.11k | £323.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £47.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Dec 2014 as amended on 23 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH ADVANCING EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY IN THE ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9b Station Avenue
CATERHAM
CR3 6LB
- Phone:
- 01883 818300
- Email:
- info@delightcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window