LINCOLN FILM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lincoln Film Society (?LFS?) promotes learning for pleasure by people of the City of Lincoln through the continued development of their understanding of film. LFS organises and presents film events, predominantly screenings, supplemented by talks from invited actors, directors, people who perform off-screen functions, and concluding with open discussions among the audience after each film.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 01 April 2014: CIO registration
- LFS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HALL | Chair | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROSSINGTON | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LES DICKER | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
IVOR DAVEY | Trustee | 27 March 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.36k | £0 | £35 | £6.17k | £13.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.35k | £0 | £425 | £6.42k | £9.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE,UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS,PARTICULARLY THE ART OF FILM AND ALLIED VISUAL TECHNIQUES BY THE SCREENING OF FILMS,THE PROVISION OF FILM NOTES TO ACCOMPANY FILMS,FILM INTRODUCTIONS,VISITS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Minerva Way
North Hykeham
LINCOLN
LN6 9FG
- Phone:
- 07884007901
- Email:
- lincolnfilmsociety@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window