Financial history CAMP HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1156663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.46k £24.31k £32.82k £25.59k £27.62k
Total expenditure £26.77k £12.45k £23.44k £37.40k £42.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.71k £12.17k N/A N/A