CAMP HILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the facilities, including maintenance, bookings and promotion of the facility to all in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 14 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS ROBINSON-SMITH | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hunter | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ella Styles | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Louise White | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MAY DICKER | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUE ROBINSON-SMITH | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.46k | £24.31k | £32.82k | £25.59k | £27.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.77k | £12.45k | £23.44k | £37.40k | £42.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.71k | £12.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
A. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CAMP HILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS(HEREINAFTER CALLED"THE AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN THE COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS;B.ESTABLISH,OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF,A COMMUNITY CENTRE(HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE")AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME CO-OPERATION WITH THE NORTHAMPTON BOROUGH COUNCIL(HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE COUNCIL"),AND ANY OTHER PERSON OR BODY,IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS;C.PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camphill Community Centre
Dayrell Road
NORTHAMPTON
NN4 9RR
- Phone:
- 01604766224
- Email:
- chcomcentre@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window