DONATIONS WITH A DIFFERENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Kent based charity that concentrates on supporting physical health, mental health, and education needs dominantly within Kent but not exclusively. We run quizzes, sporting events, comedy nights, raffles and other events to raise money to fund our charitable grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 21 July 2014: CIO registration
- DWAD (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN JOHN IAN TINGEY | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ashley Pitchacaren | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Connor Styche | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Causebrook | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ella Brocklebank | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR DAN DYER BSC(HONS), MCOMPSC | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.44k | £4.65k | £44.53k | £51.16k | £61.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.22k | £17.36k | £16.59k | £37.05k | £53.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 November 2024 | 388 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 November 2024 | 388 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
219 St. Radigunds Road
DOVER
Kent
CT17 0LD
- Phone:
- 07725973578
- Email:
- info@dwad.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window