DEVON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES TO PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN DEVON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 01 July 2014: CIO registration
- 19 November 2014: Funds received from 220921 DEVON EDUCATIONAL TRUST
- DEVON EDUCATIONAL TRUST 2014 (Previous name)
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R PEART | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
Deborah Lynch | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW WHARF | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MR K TURNER | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MRS S RANDELL JOHNSON | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PAMELA FREEMAN | Trustee | 04 November 2010 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH COOK | Trustee | 07 March 1995 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.30k | £43.89k | £41.93k | £48.06k | £49.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.85k | £21.74k | £25.47k | £37.19k | £50.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 01 JUL 2014 AMENDED ON 08/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 WHOSE NORMAL PLACE OF RESIDENCE IS WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DEVON BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Devon Educational Trust
PO Box 574
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 9NJ
- Phone:
- 01626776653
- Email:
- devonedtrust@outlook.com
- Website:
-
devoneducationaltrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window