UK GREEN FILM FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK Green Film Festival brings a unique programme of feature length and short films to a nationwide network of independent cinemas across the UK. Each year the films selected to be a part of the festival deal with issues of both a global and local nature and often have not been screened before in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frank Horn | Chair | 25 June 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN MARK LONG | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL ROBERT BECK | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADAM STUART WATSON | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.04k | £8.02k | £15.58k | £14.60k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £2.86k | £15.81k | £3.43k | £8.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE PRESENTATION, AND DISSEMINATION OF FILMS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Lower Camden Place
BATH
BA1 5JJ
- Phone:
- 02035667548
- Email:
- info@ukgreenfilmfestival.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window