Financial history BROXBOURNE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1157199
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £40.36k £65.95k £57.00k £86.88k £78.77k
Total expenditure £10.30k £17.74k £25.00k £22.96k £38.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A