WEST MALLING COMMUNITY CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community choir promoting the enjoyment of singing within the choir and beyond to audiences at our concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 16 May 2014: Standard registration
- WMCC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Paul Morse | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tricia Durrant | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Diane Baker | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA COOPER | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.88k | £6.75k | £8.73k | £29.65k | £19.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £7.50k | £9.10k | £28.84k | £15.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2024 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2024 | 285 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCT 2013 as amended on 16 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE:1.TO ADVANCE,IMPROVE,DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN,AND APPRECIATION OF,THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT,INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS;2.TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Tassell Close
East Malling
West Malling
ME19 6QB
- Phone:
- 01732848986
- Email:
- westmallingcc@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window