Trustees STEEPLE ASTON PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1157941

Charity reporting is overdue by 327 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryony Rowcliffe | Chair | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Williams | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Speight | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Moorhouse | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Rupert Graham Llywelyn Alesbury | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.