Financial history SHAREDIMPACT FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1158243
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £256.26k £670.57k £620.53k £312.68k £512.53k
Total expenditure £283.65k £851.51k £95.66k £119.25k £177.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £650.84k £582.32k N/A £83.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £19.73k £38.22k N/A £63.29k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £365.94k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £835.42k £79.95k N/A £155.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £16.09k £15.71k N/A £21.94k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.18k £9.95k N/A £4.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £70.01k N/A £150.32k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £16.09k £15.71k N/A £21.94k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0