CARRATY BOTTOM EQUINE RESCUE AND RETIREMENT

Charity Number: 1158245
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The rescue and re-homing of abandoned and mistreated horse in the Swale area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,696
Total expenditure: £5,726

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 August 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAWN ALLSWORTH Chair 14 August 2014
None on record
JAMES ALLSWORTH Trustee 14 August 2014
None on record
SAMUEL PARSONS Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.78k £10.14k £8.74k £10.41k £5.70k
Total expenditure £13.79k £10.32k £10.28k £9.59k £5.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 February 2025 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 March 2025 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2025 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 March 2025 405 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 February 2025 744 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 March 2025 770 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 February 2025 1107 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 March 2025 1135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hazelbank
Oak Lane
Minster on Sea
Sheerness
ME12 3QP
Phone:
01795876611
Email:
No information available