HEARTBEAT THE BRIGHOUSE HEART SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEARTBEAT offers Exercise and Tai Chi classes, Walks and Health Walks, Social Events plus support to people in West Yorkshire who have had or are at risk of having a cardiac event. The risk factors are: had a cardiac event, high blood pressure and / or cholesterol, overweight, Diabetes type 1 or 2. HEARTBEAT raises funds to provide 24/7 public access AED's, to date 19 units
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
Governance
- 07 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BAILEY | Chair | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
James Alan Hartley | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Fletcher | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH COOPER | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis Barry Castle | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Banks | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JEAN LUNN | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR TROTT | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
TONY TRUDGILL | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE MALLETT | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHIL HAGGIS | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKE BUSSEY | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HOWARD | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY GRACE MITCHELL | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.33k | £19.86k | £31.54k | £35.03k | £36.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £19.50k | £28.06k | £34.69k | £33.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN CALDERDALE WHO HAVE SUFFERED A CARDIAC EVENT OR ARE AT RISK OF SUCH AN EVENT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, SUPPORT AND REHABILITATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brighouse Sports Club
Russell Way
BRIGHOUSE
West Yorkshire
HD6 4LX
- Phone:
- 01422204928
- Email:
- info@heartbeat.uk.com
- Website:
-
heartbeat.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window