Governing document BRO MYRDDIN BOWLS CLUB
Charity number: 1158270

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 18 AUG 2014 AMENDED ON 25/11/2015 AMENDED ON 29 NOV 2017 as amended on 30 Nov 2019 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARMARTHEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA OF WEST WALES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.