ANNABEL'S ANGELS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports Derby based cancer patients and their families by funding items and/or services to improve their quality of life. In addition to providing grants of financial assistance, the charity promotes and protects the physical and mental health of cancer patients, their families and carers in Derby and the surrounding area through practical and emotional support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derby City
Governance
- 14 July 2014: Standard registration
- 07 February 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 07 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1061812 Derby and Burton Hospitals Charity
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.38k | £40.78k | £38.89k | £18.31k | £28.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.68k | £17.44k | £31.10k | £28.22k | £16.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CANCER PATIENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window