Financial history LLANDOVERY THEATRE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 504679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.01k £10.01k £2.08k £9.41k £8.38k
Total expenditure £3.52k £9.37k £5.04k £7.99k £7.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A