ENCORE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1157719
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Encore Theatre Company is an amateur drama and music group based in Hillingdon, North West London. Open to all, the company endeavours to bring new, contemporary productions to local theatres as well as supporting a variety of community drama and arts events. It includes a thriving youth theatre.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £27,460
Total expenditure: £29,073

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 2014: CIO registration
  • 06 September 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 06 September 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ENCORE / ETC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £49.91k £31.54k £14.34k £5.19k £27.46k
Total expenditure £40.55k £40.29k £16.88k £6.91k £29.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k £8.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time