Financial history 1ST TAXAL (WHALEY BRIDGE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 504683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.36k £14.48k £25.78k £13.75k £18.50k
Total expenditure £24.04k £8.24k £16.11k £13.95k £17.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £850 £10.30k £12.76k N/A N/A