GLOBAL FUND FOR WOMEN UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Global Fund for Women UK operates as the sister charity of Global Fund for Women Inc., a grant-making charity registered and operating out of the US focusing on promoting the human rights of women, globally. GFW UK distributes UK based income to women-led organisations internationally that advance, raise awareness of and promote support for women?s human rights in their community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Algeria
- Angola
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Grenada
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kyrgyzstan
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Lithuania
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 11 March 2015: Standard registration
- 13 January 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.88k | £608.06k | £937.40k | £387.23k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.19k | £127.43k | £469.41k | £212.85k | £933.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £608.06k | £937.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £148 | £1 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £127.05k | £406.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £380 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £97.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £46.95k | £309.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £62.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 24 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/02/2015 as amended on 11 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) OF WOMEN AND GIRLS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS 2. COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION 3. RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES 4. PROMOTING POPULAR SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS 5. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS BY INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS 6. INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window