CYMER AFAN COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our core purpose is to provide library services to the community of the Upper Afan Valley - lending books, CDs and DVDs, providing newspapers, 5 public computers with wi-fi & internet access, printing and photocopying. We also plan to develop other uses for the building - to turn the library into a Hub for Community - a multi-purpose community facility with a cafe, meeting space and classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £34,164 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 08 July 2014: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF CYMMER AFAN COMMUNITY LIBRARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Ruth Roche | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison White | Trustee | 06 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE EMMETT | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LAUREN ROBERTS | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.69k | £78.63k | £263.00k | £127.75k | £92.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.08k | £63.57k | £202.00k | £183.77k | £113.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £480 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.69k | £20.31k | £195.21k | £53.58k | £34.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 08 JUL 2014 AMENDED ON 09 JAN 2018 as amended on 22 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ELECTORAL WARD OF CYMMER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ELECTORAL WARD OF CYMMER AND SURROUNDING AREAS GENERALLY, BY THE RUNNING AND MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNITY LIBRARY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cymer Afan Community Library
Station Road
Cymmer
PORT TALBOT
West Glamorgan
SA13 3HR
- Phone:
- 01639850505
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window