FARSLEY AND DISTRICT ART CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitates art classes, demonstrations, and practice sessions for all members of the community. Membership fees are minimal thus allowing access for the under privileged. We have many members of all ages from 18 to 95. Disabled and aged members are transported to the club by the able bodied members. Schools are invited to exhibitions where artists are available to discuss art work and media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 11 November 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHNSON BENTLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pauline Davidson | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Sparke | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Hopkins | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Johnson | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER MACKEY | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATE READMAN | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CORMACK | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN MITCHELL | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BOULTON | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE MYERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.88k | £3.05k | £0 | £3.39k | £5.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.17k | £1.38k | £416 | £1.99k | £5.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/11/1968 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/1975 AS AMENDED ON 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF FARSLEY AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
FARSLEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farsley Art Club, Westroyd Studios
Westroyd Park Lodge
New Street
Farsley
PUDSEY
LS28 5AS
- Phone:
- 07783488512
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window